Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Muggiasca

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1721Born
5 Mar 174624.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 176443.1AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
30 Nov 176443.1Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
5 Jan 178967.2DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Muggiasca
Bishop Giambattista Muggiasca (born , died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComo, Diocese of Como

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 176
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast