Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni de Vita

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1708BornBenevento
30 Jan 173526.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 176456.4AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
30 Nov 176456.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
1 Apr 177465.8DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Vita:
Bishop Giovanni de Vita (born , died ) Bishop of Rieti

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 354
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015