Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Maria Cardinal Ghilini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1718BornAlessandria della Paglia, Italy
22 Dec 175941.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Mar 176041.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 176344.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
24 Jul 176344.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
10 Aug 176345.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
20 Sep 177557.1CeasedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
Nov 1775³57.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta
1 Jun 177859.8Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jul 177859.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
17 Feb 178364.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
3 Apr 178768.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Maria Ghilini (VIAF: 89092047)
Tommaso Maria Cardinal Ghilini (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva

  • a priest for 27.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
  • a cardinal for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jun 1778
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 18
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016