Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raimondo Fusco, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1716³BornMontella
1740¹23.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
12 Oct 178468.1SelectedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
14 Feb 178568.5ConfirmedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
24 Feb 178568.5Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
1802¹85.4DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raimondo Fusco: VIAF:88833239
Bishop Raimondo Fusco O.F.M. Conv. (born , died 1802) Bishop of Monopoli

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 15 Jan 2016