Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Cristiani, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1729³BornMontegranaro
30 Nov 175122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
23 Sep 178253.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
29 Sep 178253.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
3 Jan 180070.9DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Cristiani
Bishop Francesco Saverio Cristiani O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 344
  • bd/d: MW, 9 Dec 2011
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016