Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Argelati, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1743BornFirenze
26 Oct 176622.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
1 Jun 179551.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
1 Jun 179551.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippos
7 Jun 179551.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippos
11 Aug 180056.7AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
22 Mar 180561.3DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Argelati
Bishop Michele Argelati O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 362
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1795, Number 8
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 236, and Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016