Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregorio Bandi

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1736BornCesene
19 Jun 178548.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 178751.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
21 Dec 178751.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
10 Apr 180265.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Bandi
Archbishop Gregorio Bandi (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne

  • a priest for 16.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 205
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1787, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Nov 2016