Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Maria Odescalchi

Deceased

Bishop of Jesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1763BornRoma
30 May 179532.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 179532.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
7 Jun 179532.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Iconium
20 Jun 179532.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
1800¹36.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
28 May 180441.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Jesi, Italy
23 Jul 181249.3DiedBishop of Jesi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Odescalchi (VIAF: 89330581)
Archbishop Antonio Maria Odescalchi (born , died ) Bishop of Jesi

  • a priest for 17.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 61
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1795, Number 7
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 242
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Nov 2016