Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Tosi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Anagni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1761BornRome
5 Jun 178625.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Jun 178625.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 180443.2AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
3 Apr 180443.2Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
21 Mar 181554.2ResignedBishop of Anagni, Italy
Nov 1837³76.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Anagni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Tosi:
Bishop Gioacchino Tosi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Anagni

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013