Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Despuig y Dameto

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1745BornPalma de Mallorca
3 Jul 177429.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 179146.5AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
29 Sep 179146.5Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
30 Mar 179247.0InstalledBishop of Orihuela, Spain
5 Jan 179549.8SelectedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
1 Jun 179550.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
30 Jun 179550.3InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
10 Aug 179550.4SelectedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
18 Dec 179550.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
13 Jan 179953.8AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
23 Mar 179954.0ResignedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
11 Jul 180358.3Elevated to Cardinal
26 Sep 180358.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
28 Dec 180358.7AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
2 May 181368.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Despuig y Dameto:
Cardinal Antonio Despuig y Dameto (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
  • a cardinal for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Jul 1803
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 87, and Page 238
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 319, and Page 430
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 109, Number 570

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013