Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Giacomo Antonio Gaetano Fraschina, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Corinthus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1750Born
10 Aug 177322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
26 Mar 180453.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
2 Apr 180453.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
27 Mar 183786.5DiedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giacomo Antonio Gaetano Fraschina
Archbishop Giovanni Giacomo Antonio Gaetano Fraschina O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Corinthus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBosco Luganese, Italy

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 4
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018