Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Franziskus von Paula Cardinal Herzan von Harras

Deceased

Bishop of Szombathely

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1735BornPraha
18 Feb 175822.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 177944.3Elevated to Cardinal
11 Dec 178045.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
13 Sep 178247.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
7 Apr 178853.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
6 Sep 179964.4SelectedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
12 May 180065.1ConfirmedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
18 May 180065.1Ordained BishopBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
1 Jun 180469.2DiedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Franziskus von Paula Herzan von Harras:
Cardinal Franziskus von Paula Herzan von Harras (born , died ) Bishop of Szombathely

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
  • a cardinal for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jul 1779
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013