Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Rico Rico

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1733BornCastalla
1 Jun 179561.5AppointedBishop of Teruel, Spain
13 Sep 179561.8Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel, Spain
31 May 179965.5DiedBishop of Teruel, Spain

MicroData Summary for Félix Rico Rico
Bishop Félix Rico Rico (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,496
  • c3+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,001
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 113, Number 591
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Feb 2016