Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rafael de Múzquiz y Aldunate

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

Note/Previous Titular See: (Abbot/San Ildefonso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1747BornViana
1 Jun 179547.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
26 Jul 179547.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
15 Apr 179951.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ávila, Spain
20 Jul 180153.8AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
12 May 182173.6DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rafael de Múzquiz y Aldunate:
Archbishop Rafael de Múzquiz y Aldunate (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 62, and Page 374
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 158
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 112, Number 588

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014