Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Benito y Tabernero

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1750BornGuadalajara
7 Oct 181464.3SelectedBishop of Solsona, Spain
19 Dec 181464.5ConfirmedBishop of Solsona, Spain
28 May 181564.9Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
25 Jul 183080.1DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Benito y Tabernero:
Bishop Manuel Benito y Tabernero (born , died ) Bishop of Solsona

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 143
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 131, Number 702

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013