Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Fernández Flórez, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}

Titular Bishop of Marcopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1764BornBujalance, Spain
10 Jul 181550.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
10 Jul 181550.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
17 Sep 181551.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marcopolis
14 Apr 181752.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
14 Aug 182257.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Fernández Flórez:
Bishop Miguel Fernández Flórez O.F.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 252
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 131, Number 705

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013