Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Gregorio López Castillo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain

Titular Bishop of Loryma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1759Born
4 Sep 181556.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
4 Sep 181556.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
15 Oct 181556.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
30 Sep 182566.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis Gregorio López Castillo
Bishop Luis Gregorio López Castillo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmagro

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 46
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 132, Number 709

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018