Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Higinio Durán y Martel, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1755Born
15 Jan 179338.0ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
18 Dec 181560.9AppointedBishop of Panamá
4 Aug 181661.5Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
3 Aug 181762.5InstalledBishop of Panamá
22 Oct 182368.7DiedBishop of Panamá

MicroData Summary for José Higinio Durán y Martel
Bishop José Higinio Durán y Martel O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Panamá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Peru

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,816, Number 38
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 297
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 134, Number 721

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast