Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe González Abarca, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santander


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1765BornAvilés
179125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
22 Jul 181650.7AppointedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
27 Oct 181651.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ibiza, Spain
30 Aug 182963.8SelectedBishop of Santander, Spain
28 Sep 182963.9ConfirmedBishop of Santander, Spain
12 Mar 184276.4DiedBishop of Santander, Spain

MicroData Summary for Felipe González Abarca:
Bishop Felipe González Abarca O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Santander

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 221, and Page 333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013