Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador de Sanmartin y Cuevas

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1757BornGuadalajara
3 Jun 178123.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 181659.0AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
6 Oct 181659.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
20 Jul 181861.0InstalledBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
9 Feb 182163.6DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

MicroData Summary for Salvador de Sanmartin y Cuevas:
Bishop Salvador de Sanmartin y Cuevas (born , died ) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 149
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 134, Number 722

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015