Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Isidoro Domínguez, C.R.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1762BornGalaroza, Spain
7 Apr 181957.0SelectedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
23 Aug 181957.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
16 Jan 182057.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
6 Apr 182260.0DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Domínguez:
Archbishop Isidoro Domínguez C.R.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 195
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 139, Number 748

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013