Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Manuel Ramírez de la Piscina

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1760Born
19 Dec 181454.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
9 Apr 181554.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
21 Aug 183575.1DiedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Manuel Ramírez de la Piscina
Bishop Pedro Manuel Ramírez de la Piscina (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeñacerrado

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 20
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 152
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 131, Number 701

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018