Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Mier y Campillo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Almería


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1748BornAllés de Peñamellera
24 May 180254.3AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
Sep 1802³54.5Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
16 Dec 181567.8ResignedBishop of Almería, Spain
20 May 1818³70.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Almería, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Mier y Campillo:
Bishop Francisco Javier Mier y Campillo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Almería

  • a bishop for 15.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,889
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 69
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 122, Number 647

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013