Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcos Cabello y López, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1751BornCórdoba
20 Aug 180453.3AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
2 Jun 180554.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
6 Sep 181968.4DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for Marcos Cabello y López:
Bishop Marcos Cabello y López O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013