Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Melo Portugal, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1734Born
10 Mar 179459.7SelectedBishop of Osma, Spain
12 Sep 179460.3ConfirmedBishop of Osma, Spain
16 Nov 179460.4Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
18 Dec 179561.5AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
22 Jan 181681.6DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Melo Portugal
Bishop Diego Melo Portugal O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBadajoz

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 111, Number 583
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,794, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 226, and Page 322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast