Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felipe Antonio Fernández Vallejo

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1739BornOcaña
12 Sep 179455.4AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
30 Nov 179455.6Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
18 Dec 179758.7AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
8 Dec 180061.6DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Antonio Fernández Vallejo
Archbishop Felipe Antonio Fernández Vallejo (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 112, Number 585
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1794, Number 19
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 176, and Page 363

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016