Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristóbal Pérez Viala

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1749BornVillamalea
10 Jun 181566.1AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
19 Nov 181566.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
9 Nov 182273.5DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Cristóbal Pérez Viala:
Bishop Cristóbal Pérez Viala (born , died ) Bishop of Jaca

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 132, Number 711

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015