Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Cayetano Muñoz Benavente

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}

Titular Bishop of Lycopolis

Titular See: (Abbot/Alcala la Real)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1744BornSanta Cruz de los Cáñamos
24 Jul 179752.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
24 Jul 179752.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
22 Oct 179753.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
Apr 1814³69.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
8 Jul 182479.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Cayetano Muñoz Benavente
Bishop Manuel Cayetano Muñoz Benavente (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 115, Number 603
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 15
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 269, and Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016