Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Cabrera Velasco

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1728BornBadajoz
1 Jun 179566.4AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
2 Aug 179566.6Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
24 Jul 179768.6AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
22 Jan 179970.1DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Cabrera Velasco
Bishop Francisco Javier Cabrera Velasco (born , died ) Bishop of Ávila

  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,652
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 62, and Page 319
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 113, Number 589
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016