Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlos Cardinal Borja Centellas y Ponce de León

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1663Born
20 Jul 170542.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
30 Nov 170542.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
3 Oct 170845.4AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
30 Sep 172057.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 172158.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
8 Aug 173370.2DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

MicroData Summary
Carlos Borja Centellas y Ponce de León
Carlos Cardinal Borja Centellas y Ponce de León
(born , died )
Patriarch of West Indies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGandía, Archdiocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopIncarnation, Convent, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceReal Sitio de San Ildefonso, La Granja, Diocese of Segovia
Buried Place (Original)Jesuit Professed House, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

Relatives
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
  • a cardinal for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Sep 1720
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 228, and Page 386
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 24, Number 39
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1705, Number 14
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,624

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 21 May 2025