Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Olaso Hipenza, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1654BornCalahorra
22 May 171459.5AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
15 Jul 171459.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lérida, Spain
6 May 173580.5DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Olaso Hipenza:
Bishop Francisco Olaso Hipenza O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Lérida

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,637
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 30, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013