Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Esquivel Castillejos, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Titular Bishop of Lycopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1662²Born
14 Mar 171755.2SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
1 Oct 171755.7ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
1 Oct 171755.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
21 Dec 171755.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
11 Jul 173876.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Esquivel Castillejos
Bishop José Esquivel Castillejos O.P. (born 1662, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarmona

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,642
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 250
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 35, Number 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Feb 2017