Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José de Escalona y Calatayud

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1677BornQuer de la Rioja, Spain
15 Mar 171739.7AppointedBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
30 May 171739.9Ordained BishopBishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
15 Nov 172851.3AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
14 Oct 172952.3InstalledBishop of Michoacán, México
23 May 173759.9DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

MicroData Summary for Juan José de Escalona y Calatayud:
Bishop Juan José de Escalona y Calatayud (born , died ) Bishop of Michoacán

  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 262, and Page 409
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 35, Number 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013