Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio Francisco Mellado Eguíluz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

Titular Bishop of Lares


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1672BornMadrid
30 Mar 171643.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
30 Mar 171643.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
30 Nov 171643.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lares

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Francisco Mellado Eguíluz:
Bishop Dionisio Francisco Mellado Eguíluz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 34, Number 108
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 13 Aug 2015