Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gabriel Zapata Illescas

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1678²BornToledo
3 Jul 172042.5AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
8 Sep 172042.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
3 Jan 172749.0DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Gabriel Zapata Illescas:
Bishop José Gabriel Zapata Illescas (born 1678, died ) Bishop of Zamora

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,643
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 38, Number 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 422

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015