Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín Zalayeta Lizarza

Deceased

Bishop of León, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 May 1720AppointedBishop of León, Spain
18 Aug 1720Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
11 Sep 1728DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Martín Zalayeta Lizarza
Bishop Martín Zalayeta Lizarza (died ) Bishop of León

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamplona

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 38, Number 129
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,720, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast