Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé Camacho Madueño

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Mar 1720AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
12 May 1720Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
1 Apr 1757DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Camacho Madueño
Bishop Bartolomé Camacho Madueño (died ) Bishop of Tortosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontoro

  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 184
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 37, Number 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast