Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel Herrero Esgueva

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Apr 1720AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
2 Jun 1720Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
20 Jan 1723AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
27 Jul 1727DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Herrero Esgueva
Archbishop Miguel Herrero Esgueva (died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSotillo de la Ribera

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,745
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 37, Number 125
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 166, and Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018