Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Santa Maria Salazar

Deceased

Bishop of Lugo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1666BornNogales
4 Mar 172054.1AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
26 May 172054.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
2 Sep 173468.6DiedBishop of Lugo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Santa Maria Salazar:
Bishop Manuel Santa Maria Salazar (born , died ) Bishop of Lugo

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 37, Number 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013