Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Garcia Avello y Castrillón

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1676³BornLa Marea
8 Feb 173053.8AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
Apr 1730³54.0Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
30 Oct 174468.5DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Garcia Avello y Castrillón:
Bishop Juan Garcia Avello y Castrillón (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 300
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 48, Number 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015