Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Estela, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1666²BornPalma de Mallorca
16 Jul 172155.5AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
12 Oct 172155.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
6 Mar 172761.2DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Estela:
Bishop Miguel Estela O.M. (died ) Bishop of Jaca

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 224
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 39, Number 141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013