Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal del Giudice

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Monreale

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1647BornNaples
13 Feb 169042.1Elevated to Cardinal
10 Apr 169042.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
30 Mar 170052.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
14 Jan 170456.1AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
10 Feb 170456.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
12 Jul 171769.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
3 Mar 172173.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
12 Jun 172476.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
15 Feb 172577.1RetiredArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
10 Oct 172577.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco del Giudice:
Francesco Cardinal del Giudice (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Monreale

  • a bishop for 21.6 years
  • a cardinal for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Feb 1690

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015