Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselmo de la Peña, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1654²BornRivadavia, Spain
2 Oct 171965.8AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
15 Oct 171965.8Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
27 Sep 172369.7AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
4 Aug 172975.6DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anselmo de la Peña:
Bishop Anselmo de la Peña O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 73, and Page 174
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 36, Number 958

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013