Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Aguado, C.R.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1648BornMadrid
22 May 171365.3AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
2 Jul 171365.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
19 Apr 171668.2DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Aguado:
Bishop Pedro Aguado C.R.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Pamplona

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,633
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 28, Number 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015