Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Alejandro Sarmiento Sotomayor, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoņedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1683³Born
26 Jan 172844.7AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
11 Apr 172844.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
21 Sep 172845.4AppointedBishop of Mondoņedo, Spain
18 Oct 175168.4DiedBishop of Mondoņedo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Alejandro Sarmiento Sotomayor
Bishop Antonio Alejandro Sarmiento Sotomayor O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoņedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParroquia de San Jorge de Riva de Vea

  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 224, and Page 269
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1700, Page 45, Number 181
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018