Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Téllez, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Rodrigo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1660²BornCasarrubios del Monte
3 Feb 172161.1AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
27 Apr 172161.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
2 Mar 173878.2RetiredBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
20 Aug 174181.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Téllez:
Bishop Gregorio Téllez O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ciudad Rodrigo

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 159
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 39, Number 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013