Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felipe de los Tueros Huerta

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1675Born
3 Feb 172145.8AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
4 May 172146.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
20 Jan 173458.8AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
12 Sep 175176.4DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

MicroData Summary for Felipe de los Tueros Huerta
Archbishop Felipe de los Tueros Huerta (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValle de Trucios

  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 214
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 228
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 39, Number 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018