Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Sancho Granado

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1681Born
1 Nov 172947.8SelectedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
7 Nov 172947.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 172948.0ConfirmedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
19 Mar 173048.2Ordained BishopBishop of Salamanca, Spain
30 Sep 174866.8DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Sancho Granado
Bishop José Sancho Granado (born , died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArganda del Rey
Ordained BishopMadrid

  • a priest for 18.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 48, Number 959
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1730, Number 12
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,079

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast