Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Antonio Oruña

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1698BornColindres
28 Sep 174446.3AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
22 Nov 174446.4Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
4 Mar 174849.7DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Antonio Oruña:
Bishop Juan Antonio Oruña (born , died ) Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,626

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013