Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Salgado Quirago

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1678Born
24 Mar 173455.9AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
6 Jun 173456.1Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
Apr 1744³65.9DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Salgado Quirago
Bishop Francisco Salgado Quirago (born , died Apr 1744) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 52, Number 222
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1734, Number 18
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,971

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast